House | 05/04/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2551 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 1483 | |
House | 04/04/2011 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 1483 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 762 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 762 | |
House | 03/07/2011 | Filed |