Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2350 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            82R7986 MTB-D
 By: Larson H.B. No. 2350


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the Texas Transportation Commission
 and the selection of members of that commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 201.051(a) and (d), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The Texas Transportation Commission consists of three
 [five] members elected statewide [appointed by the governor with
 the advice and consent of the senate].
 (d)  A [Except as provided by Subsection (e), a] person may
 not serve [is not eligible for appointment] as a member of the
 commission if the person or the person's spouse:
 (1)  is employed by or participates in the management
 of a business entity or other organization that is regulated by or
 receives funds from the department;
 (2)  directly or indirectly owns or controls more than
 10 percent interest in a business entity or other organization that
 is regulated by or receives funds from the department;
 (3)  uses or receives a substantial amount of tangible
 goods, services, or funds from the department, other than
 compensation or reimbursement authorized by law for commission
 membership, attendance, or expenses; or
 (4)  is registered, certified, or licensed by the
 department.
 SECTION 2.  Section 201.052, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.052.  TERMS. Members of the commission serve
 staggered six-year terms, with the term [terms] of [either] one
 member [or two members] expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered
 year.
 SECTION 3.  Section 201.053(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The members of the commission shall elect from among
 their membership [governor periodically shall designate one
 commissioner as] the chair of the commission, who shall serve as
 presiding officer of the commission.
 SECTION 4.  Section 201.057(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  It is a ground for removal from the commission if a
 commissioner:
 (1)  does not have at the time of election or
 appointment or maintain during service on the commission the
 qualifications required by Section 201.051;
 (2)  violates a prohibition provided by Section
 201.051;
 (3)  cannot discharge the commissioner's duties for a
 substantial part of the term for which the commissioner is elected
 or appointed because of illness or disability; or
 (4)  is absent from more than half of the regularly
 scheduled commission meetings that the commissioner is eligible to
 attend during a calendar year, unless the absence is excused by
 majority vote of the commission.
 SECTION 5.  Sections 201.059(a) and (c), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  To be eligible to take office as a member of the
 commission, a person elected or appointed to the commission must
 complete at least one course of a training program that complies
 with this section.
 (c)  A person elected or appointed to the commission is
 entitled to reimbursement for travel expenses incurred in attending
 the training program, as provided by the General Appropriations Act
 and as if the person were a member of the commission.
 SECTION 6.  Section 52.092(c), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  Statewide offices of the state government shall be
 listed in the following order:
 (1)  governor;
 (2)  lieutenant governor;
 (3)  attorney general;
 (4)  comptroller of public accounts;
 (5)  commissioner of the General Land Office;
 (6)  commissioner of agriculture;
 (7)  commissioner of transportation;
 (8)  railroad commissioner;
 (9) [(8)]  chief justice, supreme court;
 (10) [(9)]  justice, supreme court;
 (11) [(10)]  presiding judge, court of criminal
 appeals;
 (12) [(11)]  judge, court of criminal appeals.
 SECTION 7.  Sections 201.051(b), (c), and (i),
 Transportation Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 8.  (a) The first members of the Texas
 Transportation Commission elected under the changes in law made by
 this Act shall be elected at the general election held in November
 2012 to serve for a term that begins February 1, 2013.  The members
 elected at that election shall draw lots to determine which
 member's term expires February 1, 2015, which member's term expires
 February 1, 2017, and which member's term expires February 1, 2019.
 (b)  Until the members of the Texas Transportation
 Commission elected under this Act take office, the governor will
 continue to appoint members to the Texas Transportation Commission
 and those members shall, unless otherwise removed as provided by
 law, continue in office under the prior law that governed the
 composition of the Texas Transportation Commission, and that prior
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.