1 | 1 | | 82R22229 ALB-F |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Quintanilla, Chisum, Margo, Garza, H.B. No. 2369 |
---|
3 | 3 | | et al. |
---|
4 | 4 | | Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2369: |
---|
5 | 5 | | By: Kolkhorst C.S.H.B. No. 2369 |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to the accreditation of training programs and examinations |
---|
11 | 11 | | for certain emergency medical services personnel. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Section 773.050, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
14 | 14 | | amended by adding Subsections (b-1) and (b-2) to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (b-1) A paramedic education course or training program is |
---|
16 | 16 | | not required to be accredited by a national organization before |
---|
17 | 17 | | January 1, 2014, unless, not later than September 1, 2012, the |
---|
18 | 18 | | department sets an earlier date in accordance with a recommendation |
---|
19 | 19 | | of the advisory council established under Section 773.012. |
---|
20 | 20 | | (b-2) Not later than January 1, 2013, the department shall |
---|
21 | 21 | | partner with a testing entity that administers an examination that |
---|
22 | 22 | | qualifies the examinee for licensure as a paramedic. The |
---|
23 | 23 | | department may not reimburse the testing entity for administering |
---|
24 | 24 | | an examination, but the testing entity may charge a fee to an |
---|
25 | 25 | | examinee. This subsection expires January 1, 2015. |
---|
26 | 26 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
27 | 27 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
28 | 28 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
29 | 29 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
30 | 30 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|