Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2369 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            82R22229 ALB-F
 By: Quintanilla, Chisum, Margo, Garza, H.B. No. 2369
 et al.
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2369:
 By:  Kolkhorst C.S.H.B. No. 2369


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the accreditation of training programs and examinations
 for certain emergency medical services personnel.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 773.050, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (b-1) and (b-2) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  A paramedic education course or training program is
 not required to be accredited by a national organization before
 January 1, 2014, unless, not later than September 1, 2012, the
 department sets an earlier date in accordance with a recommendation
 of the advisory council established under Section 773.012.
 (b-2)  Not later than January 1, 2013, the department shall
 partner with a testing entity that administers an examination that
 qualifies the examinee for licensure as a paramedic. The
 department may not reimburse the testing entity for administering
 an examination, but the testing entity may charge a fee to an
 examinee. This subsection expires January 1, 2015.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.