Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2385 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Harris) H.B. No. 2385
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 April 28, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 12, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 12, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the DNA database at the University of North Texas Health
 Science Center at Fort Worth.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 63, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended by adding Article 63.0515 to read as follows:
 Art. 63.0515.  CRIMINAL JUSTICE AGENCY. For purposes of
 this subchapter, the center is a criminal justice agency that
 performs forensic DNA analyses on evidence, including evidence
 related to a case involving unidentified human remains or a
 high-risk missing person. The center shall comply with 42 U.S.C.
 Section 14132.
 SECTION 2.  Article 63.052(b), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The [sole purpose of the] database may be used [is] to
 identify unidentified human remains and high-risk missing persons.
 SECTION 3.  Article 63.052(c), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is repealed.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *