House | 05/12/2011 | Postponed | 5/12/11 10:25 PM | Journal Page: 3798 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 18 | Journal Page: 3798 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3797 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2323 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 1069 | |
House | 03/23/2011 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 1069 | |
House | 02/15/2011 | Referred to Voter Identification & Voter Fraud, Select | Journal Page: 355 | |
House | 02/15/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 355 | |
House | 11/10/2010 | Filed |