05/04/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |||
05/03/2011 | Committee report distributed | |||
05/03/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |||
04/21/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | |||
04/21/2011 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |||
04/21/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |||
04/21/2011 | Considered in public hearing | |||
04/07/2011 | Left pending in committee | |||
04/07/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |||
04/07/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |||
03/31/2011 | Meeting cancelled | |||
03/14/2011 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | |||
03/14/2011 | Correction in referral | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Corrections | |||
03/10/2011 | Read first time | |||
03/07/2011 | Filed |