Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2418 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Callegari (Senate Sponsor - Patrick) H.B. No. 2418
22 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
33 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
44 Natural Resources; May 11, 2011, reported favorably by the
55 following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 11, 2011, sent to printer.)
66
77
88 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
99 AN ACT
1010 relating to the territory, board of directors, and powers of the
1111 North Harris County Regional Water Authority.
1212 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1313 SECTION 1. Section 1.03, Chapter 1029, Acts of the 76th
1414 Legislature, Regular Session, 1999, is amended by amending
1515 Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (b-1), (b-2), (f), (g), and
1616 (h) to read as follows:
1717 (b) The authority includes the [only that] territory
1818 described by Subsection (a) of this section only if that territory
1919 is also in one or more of the following state representative
2020 districts as described by Article II, Chapter 2, Acts of the 72nd
2121 Legislature, 3rd Called Session, 1992 (Article II, Article 195a-11,
2222 Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), as the districts existed on the
2323 effective date of this Act:
2424 (1) District 127;
2525 (2) District 126;
2626 (3) District 130;
2727 (4) District 135; and
2828 (5) District 150.
2929 (b-1) The authority also includes the territory of the
3030 following districts:
3131 (1) Harris County Municipal Utility District No. 16;
3232 (2) Harris County Municipal Utility District No. 26;
3333 (3) Harris County Municipal Utility District No. 233;
3434 (4) Richey Road Municipal Utility District;
3535 (5) Harris County Water Control and Improvement
3636 District No. 109;
3737 (6) Inverness Forest Improvement District; and
3838 (7) Memorial Hills Utility District.
3939 (b-2) The territory of the authority does not include
4040 property that lies within the boundaries of a local government,
4141 other than the authority, if:
4242 (1) the local government had a groundwater reduction
4343 plan approved by the subsidence district before January 1, 2010;
4444 and
4545 (2) the property was included in the local
4646 government's approved groundwater reduction plan on January 1,
4747 2010.
4848 (f) Territory annexed by a local government located in the
4949 authority becomes territory of the authority on the effective date
5050 of the annexation, unless the annexed territory is included in
5151 another local government's approved groundwater reduction plan as
5252 of the effective date of the annexation. The authority by rule may
5353 require the local government to send to the authority:
5454 (1) written notice of the effective date of an
5555 annexation; and
5656 (2) copies of documents describing the annexed land
5757 and describing the new boundaries of the local government.
5858 (g) If territory is added to the service area of a person
5959 owning a water system located in the authority, the territory
6060 becomes territory of the authority on the effective date of the
6161 territory's addition to the service area, unless the added
6262 territory is included in another local government's approved
6363 groundwater reduction plan as of the effective date of the
6464 addition. The authority by rule may require the person to send to
6565 the authority:
6666 (1) written notice of the effective date of an
6767 addition of territory; and
6868 (2) copies of documents describing the added territory
6969 and describing the new boundaries of the person's service area.
7070 (h) The annexation or addition of territory to the authority
7171 under this section does not affect the validity of bonds issued by
7272 the authority.
7373 SECTION 2. Section 1.05, Chapter 1029, Acts of the 76th
7474 Legislature, Regular Session, 1999, is amended by adding Subsection
7575 (c) to read as follows:
7676 (c) The following laws do not apply to the authority:
7777 (1) Chapter 36, Water Code;
7878 (2) Section 49.052, Water Code; and
7979 (3) Sections 49.451-49.455, Water Code.
8080 SECTION 3. Section 2.03, Chapter 1029, Acts of the 76th
8181 Legislature, Regular Session, 1999, is amended to read as follows:
8282 Sec. 2.03. SERVICE OF DIRECTORS. Directors
8383 [(a) Temporary directors serve until the initial permanent
8484 directors are elected under Section 2.05 of this Act.
8585 [(b) The initial permanent directors serve until permanent
8686 directors are elected under Section 2.06 of this Act.
8787 [(c) Permanent directors] serve staggered four-year terms.
8888 [(d) A director serves until the director's successor has
8989 qualified.]
9090 SECTION 4. The heading to Section 4.04, Chapter 1029, Acts
9191 of the 76th Legislature, Regular Session, 1999, is amended to read
9292 as follows:
9393 Sec. 4.04. CIVIL PENALTY; CIVIL ACTION; INJUNCTION.
9494 SECTION 5. Section 4.04, Chapter 1029, Acts of the 76th
9595 Legislature, Regular Session, 1999, is amended by adding
9696 Subsections (b-1) and (e) to read as follows:
9797 (b-1) The authority may bring an action in a district court
9898 against a district, other political subdivision, or other person
9999 located in the authority's territory or included in the authority's
100100 groundwater reduction plan to:
101101 (1) recover any fees, rates, charges, assessments,
102102 collection expenses, attorney's fees, interest, penalties, or
103103 administrative penalties due the authority; or
104104 (2) enforce the authority's rules or orders.
105105 (e) Governmental immunity from suit or liability of a
106106 district or other political subdivision is waived for the purposes
107107 of an action described by Subsection (b-1) of this section.
108108 SECTION 6. The following sections of Chapter 1029, Acts of
109109 the 76th Legislature, Regular Session, 1999, are repealed:
110110 (1) Section 2.04;
111111 (2) Section 2.05; and
112112 (3) Section 2.07.
113113 SECTION 7. (a) The legal notice of the intention to
114114 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
115115 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
116116 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
117117 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
118118 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
119119 Government Code.
120120 (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has
121121 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
122122 Environmental Quality.
123123 (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
124124 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
125125 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
126126 representatives within the required time.
127127 (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
128128 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
129129 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
130130 and accomplished.
131131 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
132132 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
133133 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
134134 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
135135 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
136136 * * * * *