Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2418 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Callegari (Senate Sponsor - Patrick) H.B. No. 2418
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources; May 11, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 11, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the territory, board of directors, and powers of the
 North Harris County Regional Water Authority.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1.03, Chapter 1029, Acts of the 76th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1999, is amended by amending
 Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (b-1), (b-2), (f), (g), and
 (h) to read as follows:
 (b)  The authority includes the [only that] territory
 described by Subsection (a) of this section only if that territory
 is also in one or more of the following state representative
 districts as described by Article II, Chapter 2, Acts of the 72nd
 Legislature, 3rd Called Session, 1992 (Article II, Article 195a-11,
 Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), as the districts existed on the
 effective date of this Act:
 (1)  District 127;
 (2)  District 126;
 (3)  District 130;
 (4)  District 135; and
 (5)  District 150.
 (b-1)  The authority also includes the territory of the
 following districts:
 (1)  Harris County Municipal Utility District No. 16;
 (2)  Harris County Municipal Utility District No. 26;
 (3)  Harris County Municipal Utility District No. 233;
 (4)  Richey Road Municipal Utility District;
 (5)  Harris County Water Control and Improvement
 District No. 109;
 (6)  Inverness Forest Improvement District; and
 (7)  Memorial Hills Utility District.
 (b-2)  The territory of the authority does not include
 property that lies within the boundaries of a local government,
 other than the authority, if:
 (1)  the local government had a groundwater reduction
 plan approved by the subsidence district before January 1, 2010;
 and
 (2)  the property was included in the local
 government's approved groundwater reduction plan on January 1,
 2010.
 (f)  Territory annexed by a local government located in the
 authority becomes territory of the authority on the effective date
 of the annexation, unless the annexed territory is included in
 another local government's approved groundwater reduction plan as
 of the effective date of the annexation. The authority by rule may
 require the local government to send to the authority:
 (1)  written notice of the effective date of an
 annexation; and
 (2)  copies of documents describing the annexed land
 and describing the new boundaries of the local government.
 (g)  If territory is added to the service area of a person
 owning a water system located in the authority, the territory
 becomes territory of the authority on the effective date of the
 territory's addition to the service area, unless the added
 territory is included in another local government's approved
 groundwater reduction plan as of the effective date of the
 addition. The authority by rule may require the person to send to
 the authority:
 (1)  written notice of the effective date of an
 addition of territory; and
 (2)  copies of documents describing the added territory
 and describing the new boundaries of the person's service area.
 (h)  The annexation or addition of territory to the authority
 under this section does not affect the validity of bonds issued by
 the authority.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1.05, Chapter 1029, Acts of the 76th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1999, is amended by adding Subsection
 (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The following laws do not apply to the authority:
 (1)  Chapter 36, Water Code;
 (2)  Section 49.052, Water Code; and
 (3)  Sections 49.451-49.455, Water Code.
 SECTION 3.  Section 2.03, Chapter 1029, Acts of the 76th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1999, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 2.03.  SERVICE OF DIRECTORS.  Directors
 [(a)     Temporary directors serve until the initial permanent
 directors are elected under Section 2.05 of this Act.
 [(b)     The initial permanent directors serve until permanent
 directors are elected under Section 2.06 of this Act.
 [(c)  Permanent directors] serve staggered four-year terms.
 [(d)     A director serves until the director's successor has
 qualified.]
 SECTION 4.  The heading to Section 4.04, Chapter 1029, Acts
 of the 76th Legislature, Regular Session, 1999, is amended to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 4.04.  CIVIL PENALTY; CIVIL ACTION; INJUNCTION.
 SECTION 5.  Section 4.04, Chapter 1029, Acts of the 76th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1999, is amended by adding
 Subsections (b-1) and (e) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  The authority may bring an action in a district court
 against a district, other political subdivision, or other person
 located in the authority's territory or included in the authority's
 groundwater reduction plan to:
 (1)  recover any fees, rates, charges, assessments,
 collection expenses, attorney's fees, interest, penalties, or
 administrative penalties due the authority; or
 (2)  enforce the authority's rules or orders.
 (e)  Governmental immunity from suit or liability of a
 district or other political subdivision is waived for the purposes
 of an action described by Subsection (b-1) of this section.
 SECTION 6.  The following sections of Chapter 1029, Acts of
 the 76th Legislature, Regular Session, 1999, are repealed:
 (1)  Section 2.04;
 (2)  Section 2.05; and
 (3)  Section 2.07.
 SECTION 7.  (a)  The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b)  The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d)  All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *