Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2422 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Thompson (Senate Sponsor - Harris) H.B. No. 2422
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the procedure for providing a copy of the final decree
 of dissolution of a marriage to a party who waived service of
 process.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 6.710, Family Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 6.710.  NOTICE [COPY] OF FINAL DECREE. The clerk of the
 court shall mail a notice of the signing [copy] of the final decree
 of dissolution of a marriage to the party who waived service of
 process under Section 6.4035 [by mailing the copy of the decree to
 the party] at the mailing address contained in the waiver or [to]
 the office of the party's attorney of record. The notice must state
 that a copy of the decree is available at the office of the clerk of
 the court and include the physical address of that office.
 SECTION 2.  Section 6.710, Family Code, as amended by this
 Act, applies to a suit for dissolution of a marriage filed on or
 after the effective date of this Act.  A suit for dissolution of a
 marriage filed before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law in effect on the date the suit was filed, and the former law
 is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *