House | 04/20/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2073 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1226 | Journal Page: 2070 |
House | 04/13/2011 | Postponed | 4/20/11 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1756 |
House | 04/13/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1756 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Corrected comm. report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | Journal Page: 1545 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1151 | |
House | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 779 | |
House | 03/14/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 779 | |
House | 03/07/2011 | Filed |