E
|
05/28/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6874
|
E
|
05/18/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2469
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4060
|
House
|
05/15/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4064
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3966
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2287
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2287
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2287
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2287
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2286
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2286
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2286
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1298
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2171
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2056
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#483
|
Journal Page: 2055
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2055
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2055
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1988
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1988
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1988
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1686
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 782
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 782
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|