Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2468 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Phillips (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 2468
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2011;
 April 29, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 10, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 10, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to providing a patron of a pay-to-park or valet parking
 service with certain information; providing a civil penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle C, Title 5, Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 106 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 106. PAY-TO-PARK AND VALET PARKING SERVICES
 Sec. 106.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Pay-to-park service" means a business that
 provides a place to park the motor vehicles of patrons of a public
 accommodation in a garage, lot, or other facility for a fee.
 (2)  "Public accommodation" means any:
 (A)  inn, hotel, or motel;
 (B)  restaurant, cafeteria, or other facility
 principally engaged in selling food for consumption on the
 premises;
 (C)  bar, nightclub, or other facility engaged in
 selling alcoholic beverages for consumption on the premises;
 (D)  motion picture house, theater, concert hall,
 stadium, or other place of exhibition or entertainment; or
 (E)  other facility used by or open to members of
 the public.
 (3)  "Valet parking service" means a parking service
 through which the motor vehicles of patrons of a public
 accommodation are parked for a fee by a third party who is not an
 employee of the public accommodation.
 Sec. 106.002.  APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. This chapter does
 not apply to a pay-to-park or valet parking service:
 (1)  operated by the owner of:
 (A)  a restaurant, cafeteria, or other facility
 principally engaged in selling food for consumption on the
 premises; or
 (B)  an inn, hotel, or motel; and
 (2)  provided exclusively to patrons of the public
 accommodation described by Subdivision (1).
 Sec. 106.003.  REQUIREMENT OF CONTACT INFORMATION. (a) The
 receipt or claim ticket that an operator of a pay-to-park or valet
 parking service provides to a patron must state the name, address,
 and telephone number of the owner of the pay-to-park or valet
 parking service.
 (b)  If a pay-to-park service does not provide a patron with
 a receipt or claim ticket, the operator shall prominently display
 the name, address, and telephone number of the owner of the
 pay-to-park service on a sign on or immediately adjacent to the
 payment receptacle or other device for making payment for the
 service.
 (c)  For purposes of this section, "owner" does not include
 the owner of the property on which the pay-to-park or valet parking
 service is provided unless the service is also owned by the owner of
 the property.
 Sec. 106.004.  CIVIL PENALTY. A pay-to-park or valet
 parking service that violates this chapter is subject to a civil
 penalty not to exceed $200 for each violation.
 Sec. 106.005.  SUIT FOR CIVIL PENALTY. The attorney general
 or a county or district attorney may bring an action to recover a
 civil penalty imposed under Section 106.004.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *