Senate | 05/13/2011 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 2306 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2306 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1767 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3178 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2832 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Record vote | RV#683 | Journal Page: 2831 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2831 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2831 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Amended | 1-Raymond | Journal Page: 2755 |
House | 05/03/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2092 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 782 | |
House | 03/14/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 782 | |
House | 03/08/2011 | Filed |