E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/20/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4766
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4121
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2382
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2382
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2382
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2382
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2382
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2382
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2382
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1746
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1746
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1430
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2658
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2375
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#599
|
Journal Page: 2375
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2375
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2375
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Postponed
|
4/28/11 4:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 2364
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Postponed
|
4/28/11 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2275
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2275
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2229
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2229
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1866
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 940
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 940
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|