E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/25/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5964
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3430
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5382
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5037
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2319
|
House
|
05/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3960
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1102
|
Journal Page: 3959
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3959
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3959
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 3893
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3893
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3758
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3758
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3757
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2913
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 785
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 785
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|