House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1089 | |
House | 03/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 685 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 656 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 656 | |
House | 03/02/2011 | Filed |