Senate | 05/05/2011 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1918 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1918 | |
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1741 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3092 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2684 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Record vote | RV#630 | Journal Page: 2686 |
House | 05/03/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2686 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2686 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2670 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2670 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2323 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 814 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 814 | |
House | 03/09/2011 | Filed |