Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2631 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Branch (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2631
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 5, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 5, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the advanced research program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Chapter 142, Education Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 142.  NORMAN HACKERMAN ADVANCED RESEARCH PROGRAM
 SECTION 2.  Section 142.001(4), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (4)  "Program" means the Norman Hackerman advanced
 research program established under this chapter.
 SECTION 3.  Section 142.002, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 142.002.  PURPOSE.  The Norman Hackerman advanced
 research program is established to encourage and provide support
 for basic research conducted by faculty members and students in
 astronomy, atmospheric science, biological and behavioral
 sciences, chemistry, computer sciences, earth sciences,
 engineering, information science, mathematics, material sciences,
 oceanography, physics, environmental issues affecting the
 Texas-Mexico border region, the reduction of industrial,
 agricultural, and domestic water use, social sciences, and related
 disciplines in eligible institutions.
 SECTION 4.  Section 142.004(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The program is funded by appropriations and by gifts,
 grants, and donations made for purposes of the program [that
 purpose]. [The total funds appropriated to the program may be at
 least equal to 10 percent of the average amount of the federally
 sponsored research funds allocated to all institutions of higher
 education annually during the preceding three years.]
 SECTION 5.  Section 142.004(b), Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *