Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2633 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Madden (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 2633
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 12, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 12, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the office of inspector general of the Texas Youth
 Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 61.0451(b), (f), (g), and (i), Human
 Resources Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The office of inspector general shall prepare and
 deliver a report concerning the results of any investigation
 conducted under this section to:
 (1)  the board;
 (2)  the executive commissioner;
 (3) [(2)]  the advisory board;
 (4) [(3)]  the governor;
 (5) [(4)]  the lieutenant governor;
 (6) [(5)]  the speaker of the house of representatives;
 (7) [(6)]  the standing committees of the senate and
 house of representatives with primary jurisdiction over matters
 concerning correctional facilities;
 (8) [(7)]  the special prosecution unit;
 (9) [(8)]  the state auditor; and
 (10) [(9)]  any other appropriate state agency
 responsible for licensing or certifying commission employees or
 facilities.
 (f)  The board [executive commissioner] shall select a
 commissioned peace officer as chief inspector general.  The chief
 inspector general:
 (1)  operates directly under the authority of the
 board;
 (2)  is subject to the requirements of this section;
 and
 (3)  may only be discharged by the board for cause.
 (g)  The chief inspector general shall on a quarterly basis
 prepare and deliver a report concerning the operations of the
 office of inspector general to:
 (1)  the board;
 (2)  the executive commissioner;
 (3) [(2)]  the advisory board;
 (4) [(3)]  the governor;
 (5) [(4)]  the lieutenant governor;
 (6) [(5)]  the speaker of the house of representatives;
 (7) [(6)]  the standing committees of the senate and
 house of representatives with primary jurisdiction over
 correctional facilities;
 (8) [(7)]  the state auditor; and
 (9) [(8)]  the comptroller.
 (i)  The office of inspector general shall immediately
 report to the [executive director, the] board, the governor's
 general counsel, and the state auditor:
 (1)  any particularly serious or flagrant problem
 concerning the administration of a commission program or operation;
 or
 (2)  any interference by the executive director, an
 employee of the commission, a facility described by Subsection
 (a)(2), or an officer or employee of a facility described by
 Subsection (a)(2) with an investigation conducted by the office.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *