House | 05/13/2011 | 1 legislative day notice-to call from Journal | Journal Page: 3838 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Motion to reconsider spread on the Journal | Journal Page: 3838 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 3837 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3527 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 814 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 814 | |
House | 03/09/2011 | Filed |