Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2703 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Truitt (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 2703
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of orthotists and prosthetists.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 605.002(14) and (18), Occupations Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (14)  "Orthotics" means the science and practice of
 measuring, designing, fabricating, assembling, fitting, adjusting,
 or servicing an orthosis under an order from a licensed physician,
 chiropractor, or podiatrist, or an advanced practice nurse or
 physician assistant acting under the delegation and supervision of
 a licensed physician as provided by Subchapter B, Chapter 157, and
 rules adopted by the Texas Medical Board, for the correction or
 alleviation of a neuromuscular or musculoskeletal dysfunction,
 disease, injury, or deformity.
 (18)  "Prosthetics" means the science and practice of
 measuring, designing, fabricating, assembling, fitting, adjusting,
 or servicing a prosthesis under an order from a licensed physician,
 chiropractor, or podiatrist, or an advanced practice nurse or
 physician assistant acting under the delegation and supervision of
 a licensed physician as provided by Subchapter B, Chapter 157, and
 rules adopted by the Texas Medical Board.
 SECTION 2.  Section 605.2515, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 605.2515.  ADDITIONAL LICENSE: DEVICE MANUFACTURER. A
 person licensed to practice orthotics or prosthetics who measures,
 designs, fabricates, fits, assembles, adjusts, or services an
 orthosis or a prosthesis under an order from a licensed physician,
 chiropractor, or podiatrist, or an advanced practice nurse or
 physician assistant acting under the delegation and supervision of
 a licensed physician as provided by Subchapter B, Chapter 157, and
 rules adopted by the Texas Medical Board, for a specific patient is
 exempt from licensing as a device manufacturer under Subchapter L,
 Chapter 431, Health and Safety Code. A person licensed to practice
 orthotics or prosthetics who fabricates or assembles an orthosis or
 a prosthesis without an order from a licensed physician,
 chiropractor, or podiatrist, or an advanced practice nurse or
 physician assistant acting under the delegation and supervision of
 a licensed physician as provided by Subchapter B, Chapter 157, and
 rules adopted by the Texas Medical Board, for a specific patient is
 required to be licensed as a device manufacturer under Subchapter
 L, Chapter 431, Health and Safety Code.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *