Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1425
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1425
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1384
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2281
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#553
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2236
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2236
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2006
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Referred to State Sovereignty, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 864
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 864
|
House
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|