Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2769 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Frullo (Senate Sponsor - Wentworth) H.B. No. 2769
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Government Organization; May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Texas Facilities Commission
 regarding gifts, grants, and donations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 2152, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2152.003 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2152.003.  GIFTS, GRANTS, AND DONATIONS.  The
 commission may solicit, contract for, receive, accept, or
 administer gifts, grants, and donations of money or property from
 any source for any lawful public purpose related to the commission.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *