Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2792 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hunter (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 2792
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 April 28, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 20, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2011, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the power of the Aransas County Navigation District to
 determine the amount of a check or bond necessary to purchase land
 from the district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 5001, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 5001.102 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 5001.102.  SECURITY FOR BIDS ON LAND TO BE SOLD.
 Notwithstanding Section 60.041, Water Code, the commission may
 determine the amount of the check or bond a bidder must submit with
 a bid to purchase land from the district to guarantee that the
 bidder will perform the terms of the purchase bid if it is accepted
 by the commission.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *