E
|
05/28/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6874
|
E
|
05/18/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2469
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3860
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3827
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2232
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2232
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2232
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2232
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2232
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2232
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2232
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1920
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1746
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1142
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1866
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1801
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1798
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#375
|
Journal Page: 1801
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1801
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1801
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1788
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1788
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1106
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
|
|
Journal Page: 846
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 846
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|