House | 05/12/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3527 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/08/2011 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 04/08/2011 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 851 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 851 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Filed |