Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2920 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Reynolds, Zerwas (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 2920
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 9, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 9, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a governing body of a Type C General
 Law City to adopt an ordinance to determine the manner of when
 commissioners run for elected office.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 24 of the Local Government Code,
 specifically Section 24.023 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 24.023.  REGULAR TERM OF OFFICE; REGULAR ELECTION
 DATE. (a)  The mayor and commissioners of the municipality serve
 for a term of two years unless a longer term is established under
 Article XI, Section 11, of the Texas Constitution.
 (b)  The election for mayor and commissioners shall be held
 on an authorized uniform election date as provided by Chapter 41,
 Election Code.
 (c)  The first regular election must be on an authorized
 uniform election date occurring:
 (1)  in the case of a community incorporating as a Type
 C general-law municipality, within one year after the expiration of
 the month in which the incorporation election is held; or
 (2)  in the case of a municipality changing to a Type C
 general-law municipality, within one year after the month in which
 the election on the change is held.
 (d)  In a City incorporated under this Chapter with a
 population of over 10,000 residents, the governing body may adopt
 an ordinance to determine if commissioners may be elected in
 alternate years or in the same election year.  Elections under this
 subsection shall be held on an authorized uniform election date as
 provided by Chapter 41, Election Code.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by Section 1 of this Act
 applies only to a General Law C city with a population over 10,000.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *