Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2928 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Farias (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 2928
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 12, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 12, 2011, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to privileged parking for recipients of the Silver Star
 Medal.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 681.008(b), Transportation Code, as
 amended by Chapters 115 (H.B. 2020) and 319 (H.B. 618), Acts of the
 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is reenacted and amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  A vehicle on which license plates described by
 Subsection (a)(2) or issued under Section 504.202, Section
 504.315(c), (d), (e), (f), [or] (g), or (h), or Section 504.316 are
 displayed is exempt from the payment of a parking fee collected
 through a parking meter charged by a governmental authority other
 than a branch of the federal government, when being operated by or
 for the transportation of:
 (1)  the person who registered the vehicle under
 Section 504.202(a), Section 504.315(c), (d), (e), (f), [or] (g), or
 (h), or Section 504.316;
 (2)  a person described in Section 504.202(b) if the
 vehicle is registered under that subsection; or
 (3)  the owner or operator of a vehicle displaying
 license plates described by Subsection (a)(2).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *