1 | 1 | | By: King of Zavala (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2940 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2011; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
---|
4 | 4 | | and Human Services; May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | 5 | | following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to the form of death certificates and fetal death |
---|
11 | 11 | | certificates. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Section 193.001, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
14 | 14 | | amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (a-1) In prescribing each form under Subsection (a), the |
---|
16 | 16 | | department shall ensure that the form instructs the person required |
---|
17 | 17 | | to file the death certificate or fetal death certificate to: |
---|
18 | 18 | | (1) enter the date in the standard order of "month, |
---|
19 | 19 | | day, year"; and |
---|
20 | 20 | | (2) spell out the name of the month when entering the |
---|
21 | 21 | | date. |
---|
22 | 22 | | SECTION 2. (a) The Department of State Health Services |
---|
23 | 23 | | shall revise and make available the forms required by Section |
---|
24 | 24 | | 193.001, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, not later |
---|
25 | 25 | | than January 1, 2012. |
---|
26 | 26 | | (b) A person required to file a death certificate or a fetal |
---|
27 | 27 | | death certificate is not required to use the revised form required |
---|
28 | 28 | | by Section 193.001, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, |
---|
29 | 29 | | before February 1, 2012. |
---|
30 | 30 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
31 | 31 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
32 | 32 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
33 | 33 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
34 | 34 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
35 | 35 | | * * * * * |
---|