Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2940 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: King of Zavala (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2940
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the form of death certificates and fetal death
 certificates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 193.001, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  In prescribing each form under Subsection (a), the
 department shall ensure that the form instructs the person required
 to file the death certificate or fetal death certificate to:
 (1)  enter the date in the standard order of "month,
 day, year"; and
 (2)  spell out the name of the month when entering the
 date.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The Department of State Health Services
 shall revise and make available the forms required by Section
 193.001, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, not later
 than January 1, 2012.
 (b)  A person required to file a death certificate or a fetal
 death certificate is not required to use the revised form required
 by Section 193.001, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act,
 before February 1, 2012.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *