Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2368
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 2307
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2307
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2238
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#950
|
Journal Page: 3541
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3541
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3541
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3534
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3534
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 858
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 858
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|