Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3003 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hughes (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 3003
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 19, 2011, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 19, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of an identification card to certain
 individuals to permit entrance into certain county buildings
 without passing through security services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 291.010(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commissioners court of a county [with a population
 of 2.8 million or more] by order may:
 (1)  authorize the issuance of an identification card
 to individuals permitting entrance into a county building that
 houses a justice court, county court, county court at law, or
 district court without passing through the security services
 provided under Article 102.017, Code of Criminal Procedure; and
 (2)  set a reasonable fee for the issuance of the
 identification card to individuals other than county employees.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *