E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6460
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6459
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5755
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3544
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3544
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3544
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3544
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3544
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3544
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3544
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2711
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2320
|
House
|
05/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/14/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3924
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1082
|
Journal Page: 3923
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3923
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Amended
|
1-McClendon
|
Journal Page: 3922
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3922
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3804
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3804
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3804
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2796
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 862
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 862
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|