Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3051 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Pickett, Raymond, Taylor of Collin H.B. No. 3051
 (Senate Sponsor - Rodriguez)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 13, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 13, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of child care by certain facilities
 exempt from child-care licensing requirements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.041, Human Resources Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  A child-care facility that is exempt under Subsection
 (b)(3) from the licensing requirement of Subsection (a) may provide
 care for each child at the child-care facility for not more than 15
 hours a week if the child-care facility:
 (1)  provides the child care so that a person may attend
 an educational class provided by a nonprofit entity; and
 (2)  is located in a county with a population of 800,000
 or more that is adjacent to an international border.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *