House | 05/12/2011 | Postponed | 5/12/11 10:00 PM | Journal Page: 3708 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3707 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Postponed | 5/11/11 5:00 PM | Journal Page: 3561 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3561 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Postponed | 5/10/11 9:00 PM | Journal Page: 3404 |
House | 05/10/2011 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 20(a)(1) | Journal Page: 3404 |
House | 05/10/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3404 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1545 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 864 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 864 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Filed |