Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3085 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Taylor of Galveston (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 3085
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the period of a license for a freestanding medical
 emergency care facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 254.051(f), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (f)  Notwithstanding Section 254.053(f), a [A] facility that
 is not in continuous operation 24 hours per day and 7 days per week
 cannot be issued a license with a term that extends beyond August
 31, 2013.
 SECTION 2.  Section 254.053(f), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (f)  The license fee must be paid [annually] on renewal of
 the license. The term of a license issued under this chapter is two
 years.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a license issued or renewed on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A license issued or renewed before the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law in effect immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *