Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
House
|
05/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3908
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1072
|
Journal Page: 3907
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3907
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Guillen
|
Journal Page: 3907
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3907
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3785
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1037
|
Journal Page: 3785
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3785
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(4)
|
Journal Page: 3785
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-Riddle
|
Journal Page: 3785
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
3-Schwertner
|
Journal Page: 3785
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(b)(9)
|
Journal Page: 3785
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
3-Schwertner
|
Journal Page: 3784
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
|
2-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 3783
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3783
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/12/11 4:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 3721
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3721
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Riddle and Guillen
|
Journal Page: 3719
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3719
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2657
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Subcommittee meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2011
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2011
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 314
|
House
|
02/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 314
|
House
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|