House | 05/02/2011 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Corrected comm. report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | Journal Page: 2657 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2391 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 868 | |
House | 03/18/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 868 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Filed |