House | 05/12/2011 | Returned to committee | Journal Page: 3710 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Point of order sustained | Journal Page: 3710 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3710 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Postponed | 5/11/11 8:00 PM | Journal Page: 3613 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32 | Journal Page: 3613 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3613 | |
House | 05/07/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2913 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 870 | |
House | 03/18/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 870 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Filed |