E | 05/12/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/12/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3968 | |
E | 05/03/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2914 | |
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1624 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2654 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2658 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2386 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1163 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 994 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 994 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 686 | |
House | 03/22/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1072 | |
House | 03/22/2011 | Record vote | RV#104 | Journal Page: 932 |
House | 03/22/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 932 | |
House | 03/22/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 932 | |
House | 03/21/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 909 | |
House | 03/21/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 909 | |
House | 03/21/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 02/25/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 02/25/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 541 | |
House | 02/23/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 02/23/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/23/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/15/2011 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 358 | |
House | 02/15/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 358 | |
House | 11/18/2010 | Filed |