House | 05/04/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2913 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | Journal Page: 871 | |
House | 03/18/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 871 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Filed |