House | 04/29/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1686 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1138 | |
House | 03/18/2011 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 872 | |
House | 03/18/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 872 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Filed |