Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3179 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Farias, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Davis) H.B. No. 3179
22 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
33 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
44 Affairs and Military Installations; May 12, 2011, reported
55 favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 12, 2011,
66 sent to printer.)
77
88
99 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1010 AN ACT
1111 relating to contributions to the fund for veterans' assistance.
1212 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1313 SECTION 1. Section 434.017(a), Government Code, as amended
1414 by Chapters 840 (S.B. 1940) and 1385 (S.B. 1655), Acts of the 81st
1515 Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is reenacted and amended to
1616 read as follows:
1717 (a) The fund for veterans' assistance is a special fund in
1818 the state treasury outside the general revenue fund. The fund is
1919 composed of:
2020 (1) money transferred to the fund at the direction of
2121 the legislature;
2222 (2) gifts and grants contributed to the fund;
2323 (3) the earnings of the fund; [and]
2424 (4) money transferred to the fund from proceeds of the
2525 lottery game operated under Section 466.027 or transferred to the
2626 fund under Section 466.408(b); and
2727 (5) [(2)] money deposited to the credit of the fund
2828 under Section 502.1746, Transportation Code.
2929 SECTION 2. Section 502.1746, Transportation Code, is
3030 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (c), (d),
3131 and (e) to read as follows:
3232 (b) The county assessor-collector shall send any
3333 contribution made under this section to the comptroller for deposit
3434 in the state treasury to the credit of the fund for veterans'
3535 assistance before the 31st day after the date the contribution is
3636 made. A contribution made under this section may be used only for
3737 the purposes of the fund for veterans' assistance.
3838 (c) The department shall:
3939 (1) include space on each motor vehicle registration
4040 renewal notice, on the page that states the total fee for
4141 registration renewal, that allows a person renewing a registration
4242 to indicate the amount that the person is voluntarily contributing
4343 to the fund for veterans' assistance;
4444 (2) provide an opportunity to contribute to the fund
4545 for veterans' assistance similar to the opportunity described by
4646 Subsection (a) and in the manner described by Subdivision (1) in any
4747 registration renewal system that succeeds the system in place on
4848 September 1, 2011; and
4949 (3) provide an opportunity for a person to contribute
5050 to the fund for veterans' assistance during the registration
5151 renewal process on the department's Internet website.
5252 (d) If a person makes a contribution under this section and
5353 does not pay the full amount of a registration fee, the county
5454 assessor-collector may credit all or a portion of the contribution
5555 to the person's registration fee.
5656 (e) The department shall consult with the Texas Veterans
5757 Commission in performing the department's duties under this
5858 section.
5959 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act to Section
6060 502.1746, Transportation Code, applies only to a motor vehicle
6161 registration renewal notice issued for a registration that expires
6262 on or after January 1, 2012.
6363 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
6464 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
6565 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
6666 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
6767 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
6868 * * * * *