Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3179 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Farias, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Davis) H.B. No. 3179
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 12, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 12, 2011,
 sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to contributions to the fund for veterans' assistance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 434.017(a), Government Code, as amended
 by Chapters 840 (S.B. 1940) and 1385 (S.B. 1655), Acts of the 81st
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is reenacted and amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The fund for veterans' assistance is a special fund in
 the state treasury outside the general revenue fund.  The fund is
 composed of:
 (1)  money transferred to the fund at the direction of
 the legislature;
 (2)  gifts and grants contributed to the fund;
 (3)  the earnings of the fund; [and]
 (4)  money transferred to the fund from proceeds of the
 lottery game operated under Section 466.027 or transferred to the
 fund under Section 466.408(b); and
 (5)  [(2)]  money deposited to the credit of the fund
 under Section 502.1746, Transportation Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 502.1746, Transportation Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (c), (d),
 and (e) to read as follows:
 (b)  The county assessor-collector shall send any
 contribution made under this section to the comptroller for deposit
 in the state treasury to the credit of the fund for veterans'
 assistance before the 31st day after the date the contribution is
 made. A contribution made under this section may be used only for
 the purposes of the fund for veterans' assistance.
 (c)  The department shall:
 (1)  include space on each motor vehicle registration
 renewal notice, on the page that states the total fee for
 registration renewal, that allows a person renewing a registration
 to indicate the amount that the person is voluntarily contributing
 to the fund for veterans' assistance;
 (2)  provide an opportunity to contribute to the fund
 for veterans' assistance similar to the opportunity described by
 Subsection (a) and in the manner described by Subdivision (1) in any
 registration renewal system that succeeds the system in place on
 September 1, 2011; and
 (3)  provide an opportunity for a person to contribute
 to the fund for veterans' assistance during the registration
 renewal process on the department's Internet website.
 (d)  If a person makes a contribution under this section and
 does not pay the full amount of a registration fee, the county
 assessor-collector may credit all or a portion of the contribution
 to the person's registration fee.
 (e)  The department shall consult with the Texas Veterans
 Commission in performing the department's duties under this
 section.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 502.1746, Transportation Code, applies only to a motor vehicle
 registration renewal notice issued for a registration that expires
 on or after January 1, 2012.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *