Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3208 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Burkett (Senate Sponsor - Deuell) H.B. No. 3208
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 13, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 13, 2011, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a segment of U.S. Highway 80 in the
 town of Sunnyvale as a Blue Star Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.082 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.082.  BLUE STAR MEMORIAL HIGHWAY. (a)  U.S.
 Highway 80 in the town of Sunnyvale is designated as a Blue Star
 Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as a Blue Star Memorial Highway and any other
 appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *