House | 05/11/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3606 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Record vote | RV#975 | Journal Page: 3605 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 3605 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Amendment withdrawn | 2-Chisum | Journal Page: 3604 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Amended | 1-Rodriguez | Journal Page: 3604 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3604 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2913 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 884 | |
House | 03/18/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 884 | |
House | 03/11/2011 | Filed |