E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6460
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6284
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5756
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3545
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3545
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3545
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3545
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3545
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3545
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3545
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2552
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2266
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2266
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2239
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3542
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#950
|
Journal Page: 3542
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3542
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3542
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3537
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3537
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3300
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 891
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 891
|
House
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|