House
|
05/12/2011
|
Postponed
|
7/1/11 2:24 PM
|
Journal Page: 3733
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3733
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2188
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2006
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 893
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 893
|
House
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|