Senate | 05/13/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2304 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4063 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3866 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3863 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1044 | Journal Page: 3866 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3866 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3866 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3839 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3839 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2391 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 897 | |
House | 03/18/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 897 | |
House | 03/11/2011 | Filed |